IN SB0216 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Allows a court to permit a defendant to inspect, view, and examine material that constitutes child pornography at a state or local court or law enforcement facility if the defendant demonstrates that inspecting, viewing, and examining the material is necessary to the defendant's defense. Requires a court to impose certain restrictions on the inspection, viewing, and examination of the material.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Access to child pornography in criminal discovery.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 148
2011-05-10 Signed by the Governor
2011-05-02 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-27 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-26 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-19 Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 379: yeas 46, nays 1
2011-04-11 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2011-04-08 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2011-04-08 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 433: yeas 88, nays 0
2011-04-07 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-04-04 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2011-02-03 Cosponsor: Rep. L. Lawson
2011-02-03 House sponsor: Rep. Foley
2011-02-03 Referred to the House
2011-02-03 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 67: yeas 47 and nays 1
2011-01-31 Senator Broden added as coauthor
2011-01-31 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-01-27 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2011-01-05 Authored by Senator Bray

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback