IN SB0214 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requires an agency to make certain determinations before entering into a contingency fee contract with a private attorney, and requires the inspector general to review the proposed contract and determine whether the contract would violate the code of ethics or any statute or rule concerning conflict of interest. Provides that the attorney general shall publish certain information concerning contingency fee contracts on the attorney general's web site, unless the attorney general determines that disclosing the contingency fee contract while the action is pending is not in the best interests of the state. Requires the attorney general to publish a contingency fee contract not later than 15 days after the action is concluded if the attorney general determines that disclosing the contract while the action is pending is not in the best interests of the state. Makes a technical correction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State use of contingency fee counsel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - House - Amendment 3 (DeLaney), prevailed (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 101
2011-05-09 Signed by the Governor
2011-05-02 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-27 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-26 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-19 Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 378: yeas 47, nays 0
2011-04-14 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2011-04-08 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2011-04-08 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 432: yeas 87, nays 0
2011-04-07 Amendment 3 (DeLaney), prevailed; Roll Call 412: yeas 88, nays 1
2011-04-07 Amendment 5 (DeLaney), prevailed; voice vote
2011-04-07 Amendment 1 (Foley), prevailed; voice vote
2011-04-07 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-04-04 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2011-02-17 Senator M. Young added as second author
2011-02-17 House sponsor: Rep. Foley
2011-02-17 Referred to the House
2011-02-17 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 149: yeas 50 and nays 0
2011-02-15 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-02-14 Senator Randolph added as coauthor
2011-02-14 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2011-01-05 Authored by Senator Bray

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback