IN SB0213 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Public Law 261
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Wireless support structures. Makes the following changes to the statute concerning the local permitting of wireless support structures: (1) Amends the definition of "small cell facility" to: (A) increase the maximum specified antenna volume from three cubic feet to six cubic feet per antenna; (B) eliminate the maximum specified total volume for all antennas; and (C) increase the maximum specified primary equipment enclosure volume from 17 cubic feet to 28 cubic feet. (2) Amends the definition of "utility pole" to: (A) mean a structure that is designed or used for certain specified purposes (versus existing statutory language defining the term

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wireless support structures. Makes the following changes to the statute concerning the local permitting of wireless support structures: (1) Amends the definition of "small cell facility" to: (A) increase the maximum specified antenna volume from three cubic feet to six cubic feet per antenna; (B) eliminate the maximum specified total volume for all antennas; and (C) increase the maximum specified primary equipment enclosure volume from 17 cubic feet to 28 cubic feet. (2) Amends the definition of "utility pole" to: (A) mean a structure that is designed or used for certain specified purposes (versus existing statutory language defining the term

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #3 (Stoops) failed (Y: 9 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02SenatePublic Law 261
2017-05-02SenateSigned by the Governor
2017-04-27HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-27SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-21SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 532: yeas 43, nays 7
2017-04-21HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 554: yeas 67, nays 29
2017-04-21HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2017-04-21SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2017-04-21SenateSenator Merritt added as conferee
2017-04-21SenateSenator Merritt removed as advisor
2017-04-21SenateSenator Stoops removed as conferee
2017-04-12HouseRepresentative Negele added as advisor
2017-04-11HouseHouse advisors appointed: Eberhart, DeVon, Lehman, Macer and Pierce
2017-04-11HouseHouse conferees appointed: Ober and Hatfield
2017-04-10SenateSenate advisors appointed: Merritt, Randolph Lonnie M and Bohacek
2017-04-10SenateSenate conferees appointed: Hershman and Stoops
2017-04-10SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2017-04-10SenateMotion to dissent filed
2017-04-07HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2017-04-06HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 410: yeas 93, nays 1
2017-04-05HouseAmendment #1 (Ober) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-05HouseReread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-04-04HousePlaced back on second reading
2017-04-03HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-03-30HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-21HouseRepresentative Hatfield added as cosponsor
2017-03-16HouseRepresentative Macer added as cosponsor
2017-03-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
2017-02-28SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-27SenateSenator Koch added as coauthor
2017-02-27SenateSenator Merritt added as second author
2017-02-27SenateCosponsor: Representative Lehman
2017-02-27SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Ober
2017-02-27SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 196: yeas 46, nays 3
2017-02-23SenateSenator Houchin added as coauthor
2017-02-23SenateAmendment #1 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-23SenateAmendment #3 (Stoops) failed; Roll Call 173: yeas 9, nays 40
2017-02-23SenateAmendment #2 (Stoops) failed; voice vote
2017-02-23SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-20SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-26SenateSenator Hershman added as author
2017-01-26SenateSenator Long removed as author
2017-01-26SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Utilities
2017-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2017-01-04SenateAuthored by Senator Long

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/213/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/4/a/164ad009/SB0213.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/6/d/406da26e/SB0213.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/9/6/11968f22/SB0213.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/7/4/0274c765/SB0213.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/d/d/f1dde9c3/SB0213.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/f/6/b1f6e8b8/SB0213.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/1/3/6c132f2b/SB0213.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/2/e/432eb393/SB0213.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/b/0/97b0ae92/SB0213.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/a/3/3ba3300f/SB0213.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/b/f/19bf4645/SB0213.06.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/0/5/ef05fd6c/SB0213.06.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/6/0/2d60bd03/SB0213.07.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/d/0/ead0dd58/SB0213.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/4/a/3/24a35af1/SB0213.173.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/2/0/f620c73d/SB0213.196.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/8/1/f681fea1/SB0213.04.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/2/e/2b2eb67c/SB0213.410.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/c/4/3dc47414/SB0213.554.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/d/9/eed926b3/SB0213.532.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback