IN SB0209 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 23 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Senators Young M and Taylor G added as conferees
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 23 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Senators Young M and Taylor G added as conferees
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Drug schedules. Adds specified substances to the scheduled list of controlled substances. Urges the legislative council to assign to the interim study committee on corrections and criminal code, during the 2022 legislative interim, the task of studying "delta-8 THC" and any of its related psychoactive cannabinoids.
Title
Drug schedules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #3 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 11 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #3 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 11 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senators Young M and Taylor G added as conferees |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senators Koch and Pol removed as conferees |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senators Taylor G and Young M removed as advisors |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as advisor |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Tomes, Taylor G, Young M, Doriot and Gaskill |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Koch and Pol |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senator Brown L removed as second author |
2022-02-25 | House | House advisors appointed: Teshka, Lucas and Pierce |
2022-02-25 | House | House conferees appointed: Steuerwald and Hatcher |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2022-02-23 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2022-02-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 235: yeas 91, nays 1 |
2022-02-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Young J |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 112: yeas 36, nays 12 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 86: yeas 11, nays 36 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Brown L added as second author |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young M |