IN SB0207 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Public Law 46
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Aggregate purchasing of prescription drugs. Exempts the purchase of prescription drugs dispensed from an onsite clinic from inclusion in the program for aggregate purchasing of prescription drugs by the state personnel department and state educational institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aggregate purchasing of prescription drugs. Exempts the purchase of prescription drugs dispensed from an onsite clinic from inclusion in the program for aggregate purchasing of prescription drugs by the state personnel department and state educational institutions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Provider Services - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-23SenatePublic Law 46
2015-04-23SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-04-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-21HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-15SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-04-15HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2015-04-14HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 414: yeas 94, nays 0
2015-04-13HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-04-09HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-03-02HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2015-02-03SenateReferred to the House
2015-01-26SenateRepresentatives Kirchhofer and Brown, C. added as cosponsors
2015-01-26SenateRepresentative Clere added as sponsor
2015-01-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 31: yeas 50, nays 0
2015-01-22SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2015-01-22SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2015-01-20SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-01-14SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-13SenateSenator Becker added as second author
2015-01-06SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Health & Provider Services
2015-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Miller Patricia

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/207/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/3/e/213e27c7/SB0207.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/e/f/1bef9163/SB0207.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/0/4/dc044894/SB0207.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/5/4/3b5412fb/SB0207.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/3/3/0833d999/SB0207.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/f/4/e8f48931/SB0207.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/f/7/07f722f4/SB0207.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/f/8/2cf869dd/SB0207.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/b/5/06b58bf6/SB0207.31.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/5/8/22580fb2/SB0207.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/4/1/28419e8d/SB0207.414.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback