IN SB0204 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires teacher preparation programs to report to the department of education (department) additional information concerning the teacher candidates in the programs and instructors in the programs. Requires the department to provide certain information concerning graduates who teach in Indiana to teacher preparation programs. Requires the department to establish a minimum rating for teacher preparation programs. Requires the state board of education to prepare an improvement plan for programs that do not achieve the minimum rating and to disapprove a teacher preparation program that does not follow the improvement plan or fails to achieve the minimum rating.
Title
Teacher preparation programs.
Sponsors
Sen. James Banks [R] | Sen. Carlin Yoder [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. John Broden [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 020401 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 020401 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Education |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Huston added sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 157: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Broden added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-02-03 | Senate | SB 204 Amendment #1 (Banks), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Education and Career Development |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senators Banks, Yoder, Kruse. |