IN SB0201 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 72
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Health provider ethical exemption. Includes: (1) nurses; (2) physician assistants; and (3) pharmacists; in the prohibition from being required to perform an abortion or assist or participate in procedures intended to result in an abortion if the health care provider objects to the procedures on ethical, moral, or religious grounds. (Current law applies only to physicians and employees.) Adds a prohibition on requiring certain providers to prescribe, administer, or dispense an abortion inducing drug.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health provider ethical exemption. Includes: (1) nurses; (2) physician assistants; and (3) pharmacists; in the prohibition from being required to perform an abortion or assist or participate in procedures intended to result in an abortion if the health care provider objects to the procedures on ethical, moral, or religious grounds. (Current law applies only to physicians and employees.) Adds a prohibition on requiring certain providers to prescribe, administer, or dispense an abortion inducing drug.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenatePublic Law 72
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-09HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-04SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-01SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 362: yeas 38, nays 8
2019-03-29SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-03-15HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-03-14HouseRepresentative Wesco added as cosponsor
2019-03-14HouseRepresentatives Heine, Carbaugh, Smaltz, Hostettler, Zent, Prescott, Lucas, Abbott D, Lauer, Lindauer, Thompson added as cosponsors
2019-03-14HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2019-03-14HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 314: yeas 69, nays 25
2019-03-12HouseAmendment #1 (Bacon) prevailed; voice vote
2019-03-12HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-03-07HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2019-02-20SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-19SenateCosponsors: Representatives Stutzman, Mayfield and Judy
2019-02-19SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Bacon
2019-02-19SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 151: yeas 39, nays 1
2019-02-19SenateSenator Tomes added as coauthor
2019-02-18SenateSenators Crane and Grooms added as coauthors
2019-02-18SenateSenator Holdman added as third author
2019-02-18SenateSenator Rogers added as second author
2019-02-18SenateAmendment #2 (Breaux) failed; voice vote
2019-02-18SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-14SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-04SenateSenator Bassler added as coauthor
2019-01-28SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Brown L

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/201/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/4/2/b0424416/SB0201.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/d/4/c0d413e1/SB0201.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/6/f/546fc72e/SB0201.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/d/2/f9d2ed95/SB0201.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/2/2/d3221b32/SB0201.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/b/0/7eb0f455/SB0201.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/7/f/587f61a7/SB0201.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/d/e/5bde781c/SB0201.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/7/f/f17f497a/SB0201.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/6/6/56669afc/SB0201.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/f/0/39f062ba/SB0201.151.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/0/1/d201c4b5/SB0201.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/a/d/66adfb30/SB0201.314.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/4/1/af416378/SB0201.362.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback