IN SB0201 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Allows a library board of a Class 1 or Class 2 public library to provide severance pay to a library employee who is voluntarily separated from employment with the library if the library board makes certain findings. Allows the library board of a Class 1or Class 2 public library to appropriate funds to provide membership of library employees in local, state, and national associations of a civic, educational, professional, or governmental nature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Libraries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 63
2011-04-26 Signed by the Governor
2011-04-19 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-18 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-14 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-12 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2011-04-12 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 482: yeas 92, nays 1
2011-04-11 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-04-08 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 Representative Saunders added as cosponsor
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2011-01-25 Senator Randolph added as coauthor
2011-01-25 House sponsor: Rep. Richardson
2011-01-25 Referred to the House
2011-01-25 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 39: yeas 48 and nays 1
2011-01-24 Senator Lawson added as second author
2011-01-24 Amendment 1 (Gard), prevailed;
2011-01-24 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-01-20 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2011-01-05 Authored by Senator Gard

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback