IN SB0200 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - SECTIONS 3 through 5 effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Allows the department of environmental management (IDEM) to develop and issue NPDES general permits under federal law. Establishes transitional provisions for current NPDES general permits authorized by rule. Requires IDEM to conduct an antidegradation review of all NPDES general permits. Provides that IDEM may modify the general permits for purposes of antidegradation compliance. Provides that after an antidegradation review of a permit is conducted, activities covered by an NPDES general permit are not required to undergo an additional antidegradation review. Requires IDEM to establish a general coal mine permit that may be obtained for a facility instead of obtaining another more specialized NPDES coal mine permit and to determine the criteria that must be met to qualify for the general permit. Provides that the general permit must allow a coal mine operator the option of submitting a notice of intent to be governed by the general permit requirements before the requirements apply to the coal mine operator. Requires persons regulated by a national pollutant discharge elimination systems (NPDES) general permit to submit a notice of intent within ninety (90) days after the department of environmental management makes the form available.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental general permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Wolkins), prevailed (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 SECTIONS 3 through 5 effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-18 SECTION 2 effective 04/28/2011
2011-05-18 SECTION 1 effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 81
2011-04-28 Signed by the Governor
2011-04-20 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-19 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-18 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-14 Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 354: yeas 49, nays 0
2011-04-11 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2011-04-08 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2011-04-08 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 430: yeas 87, nays 2
2011-04-07 Amendment 1 (Wolkins), prevailed; Roll Call 417: yeas 87, nays 6
2011-04-07 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-04-04 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
2011-01-25 Senator Randolph added as coauthor
2011-01-25 Senator Tallian added as coauthor
2011-01-25 House sponsor: Rep. Wolkins
2011-01-25 Referred to the House
2011-01-25 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 38: yeas 47 and nays 2
2011-01-24 Senator Charbonneau added as second author
2011-01-24 Amendment 1 (Gard), prevailed;
2011-01-24 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-01-20 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Energy and Environmental Affairs
2011-01-05 Authored by Senator Gard

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2011&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0200
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/IN/IN0200.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SB/SB0200.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SB/SB0200.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/ES/ES0200.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/ES/ES0200.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SE/SE0200.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Srollcal/0038.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0417.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0430.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Srollcal/0354.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback