IN SB0199 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - SECTION 9 effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Allows noncounty residents to be members of county governing boards with certain limitations and under certain circumstances. Requires a governing board to submit a list naming at least one but not more than three candidates for consideration of the governing board for a vacancy on the governing board and a list of qualifications for the vacancy. (Current law requires the governing board to submit three candidate names.) Requires the appointing authority of a county hospital governing board to consider a list of qualifications submitted by the governing board for assessing a candidate for a vacant governing board seat. Allows a county hospital governing board to dispose of personal property owned by the county hospital if the personal property value does not exceed $30,000. (The limit under current law is $15,000.) Requires the health finance commission to study issues concerning the credentialing of vendors in hospitals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County hospital matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 76 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 SECTION 9 effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-18 SECTIONS 1 through 8 effective 04/28/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 80
2011-04-28 Signed by the Governor
2011-04-20 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-19 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-18 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-14 Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 353: yeas 49, nays 0
2011-04-11 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2011-04-08 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2011-04-08 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 429: yeas 76, nays 12
2011-04-07 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-04-04 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2011-01-24 Cosponsors: Reps. T. Brown and Battles
2011-01-24 House sponsor: Rep. Bacon
2011-01-24 Referred to the House
2011-01-24 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 24: yeas 50 and nays 0
2011-01-18 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-01-13 Senator Miller added as second author
2011-01-12 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-10 Senator Simpson added as coauthor
2011-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2011-01-05 Authored by Senator Gard

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback