IN SB0198 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Public Law 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Sentencing. Makes committing a controlled substance offense on the property of a penal facility or juvenile facility an enhancing circumstance. Makes it an aggravating circumstance that a crime was committed because of certain perceived or actual characteristics of the victim.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentencing. Makes committing a controlled substance offense on the property of a penal facility or juvenile facility an enhancing circumstance. Makes it an aggravating circumstance that a crime was committed because of certain perceived or actual characteristics of the victim.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenatePublic Law 5
2019-04-03SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-03SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-03HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-03SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-02SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 382: yeas 34, nays 14
2019-04-02SenateSenator Glick added as third author
2019-04-02SenateSenator Young M removed as third author
2019-04-01SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-03-28SenateSenator Randolph removed as coauthor
2019-03-27HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-03-26HouseRepresentative Cook added as cosponsor
2019-03-26HouseRepresentative Bosma added as cosponsor
2019-03-26HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2019-03-26HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 347: yeas 57, nays 39
2019-03-25HouseRepresentatives Steuerwald and McNamara added as cosponsors
2019-03-25HouseAmendment #1 (Steuerwald) prevailed; voice vote
2019-03-25HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2019-01-16SenateReferred to the House
2019-01-15SenateSenator Young M added as third author
2019-01-15SenateSenator Crider added as second author
2019-01-15SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Pressel
2019-01-15SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 12: yeas 50, nays 0
2019-01-14SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-10SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-01-10SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Bohacek

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/198/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/0/d/510dcd94/SB0198.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/b/1/5ab1667d/SB0198.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/b/8/91b8f9a8/SB0198.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/a/b/59abd3af/SB0198.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/1/f/b51f63b3/SB0198.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/4/a/ea4ac9e1/SB0198.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/2/3/c5235367/SB0198.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/a/a/e/baae6ddf/SB0198.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/4/9/c3499c8e/SB0198.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/8/8/8f8892f7/SB0198.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/6/3/6a6333fc/SB0198.12.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/b/5/ddb5f13e/SB0198.02.COMS.05.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/a/1/8ea18ca3/SB0198.347.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/f/f/55ffc577/SB0198.382.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback