IN SB0198 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Public Law 230
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Career and technical education. Requires the state board of education to use data from the department of workforce development (DWD) in developing and implementing certain plans, recommendations, and other matters relating to career and technical education. Requires the department of education (department) to implement a pilot program for instruction in and use of the Indiana career explorer program and curriculum by all students in grade 8 attending the schools in 15 schools. Provides that the pilot program expires July 1, 2018, unless the department determines the pilot program shall be extended until July 1, 2019. Provides that beginning on July

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Career and technical education. Requires the state board of education to use data from the department of workforce development (DWD) in developing and implementing certain plans, recommendations, and other matters relating to career and technical education. Requires the department of education (department) to implement a pilot program for instruction in and use of the Indiana career explorer program and curriculum by all students in grade 8 attending the schools in 15 schools. Provides that the pilot program expires July 1, 2018, unless the department determines the pilot program shall be extended until July 1, 2019. Provides that beginning on July

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28SenatePublic Law 230
2017-04-28SenateSigned by the Governor
2017-04-27HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-27SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-21HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 542: yeas 98, nays 0
2017-04-21SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 524: yeas 50, nays 0
2017-04-21HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2017-04-21SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2017-04-17HouseHouse advisors appointed: Braun, Clere and Goodin
2017-04-17SenateSenate advisors appointed: Mishler, Melton, Bassler and Perfect
2017-04-17HouseHouse conferees appointed: Huston and Harris
2017-04-17SenateSenate conferees appointed: Eckerty and Niezgodski
2017-04-17SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2017-04-17SenateMotion to dissent filed
2017-04-07HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2017-04-06HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 409: yeas 97, nays 0
2017-04-05HouseRepresentative Harris added as cosponsor
2017-04-05HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2017-04-04HouseAmendment #1 (Huston) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-04HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-04-03HouseRepresentative Braun added as cosponsor
2017-03-30HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-03-01SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-28SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2017-02-28SenateCosponsors: Representatives Brown, T. and Thompson
2017-02-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Huston
2017-02-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 218: yeas 43, nays 6
2017-02-27SenateAmendment #2 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
2017-02-27SenateAmendment #1 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
2017-02-27SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-23SenateSenators Houchin and Niemeyer added as coauthors
2017-02-23SenateSenator Perfect added as coauthor
2017-02-23SenateSenators Niezgodski and Raatz added as coauthors
2017-02-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-21SenateSenators Bassler and Head added as coauthors
2017-02-21SenateSenator Mishler added as second author
2017-02-21SenateSenator Eckerty added as author
2017-02-21SenateSenator Mishler removed as author
2017-02-16SenateSenator Mishler added as author
2017-02-16SenateSenator Long removed as author
2017-02-16SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2017-01-04SenateAuthored by Senator Long

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/198/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/3/0/9c300810/SB0198.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/9/9/75997f88/SB0198.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/2/8/dc28e696/SB0198.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/1/2/65126fa0/SB0198.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/4/2/f542ca37/SB0198.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/3/4/dd3427ba/SB0198.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/b/7/75b796e7/SB0198.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/1/8/3c18d89e/SB0198.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/b/3/44b32c3d/SB0198.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/e/3/d4e3168e/SB0198.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/2/9/e329fe18/SB0198.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/7/f/757ffab7/SB0198.02.COMS.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/3/e/d63ec87d/SB0198.218.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/d/b/75db7c1a/SB0198.03.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/2/9/42297422/SB0198.409.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/e/5/e9e52ae0/SB0198.524.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/8/f/578f6392/SB0198.542.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback