IN SB0198 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-08-21 - Bill Withdrawn
Pending: Senate Health and Provider Services Committee
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-08-21 - Bill Withdrawn
Pending: Senate Health and Provider Services Committee
Summary
Requires each school corporation to: (1) report certain student health data for students in grades 3, 5, and 7 to the state department of health beginning in 2011; and (2) inform the students' parents of the data collected and the right to obtain the data. Requires the state department of health to: (1) develop materials for the school corporation to distribute concerning body mass index; and (2) publish an annual report summarizing the data collected by the school corporations. Requires the state department of health and the state board of education to adopt joint rules to implement these provisions.
Title
Student health measurements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-21 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2011-08-14 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2011-08-07 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2011-07-31 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2011-07-20 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2011-07-13 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2011-07-06 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2011-06-28 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2011-06-21 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2011-06-14 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2011-06-07 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2011-05-31 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2011-05-23 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2011-05-15 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2011-05-07 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2011-02-03 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Senator Gard |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2011&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0198 |