IN SB0197 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Public Law 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibited technology purchases. Defines "prohibited person" as a person that has been designated as posing a national security threat to the integrity of communications networks or the communications supply chain under a Federal Communications Commission rule. Prohibits money appropriated by the general assembly or a political subdivision from being granted to or used to purchase or obtain any equipment or services produced or provided by a prohibited person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibited technology purchases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenatePublic Law 8
2020-03-11SenateSigned by the Governor
2020-03-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-03HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-02SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-02-26HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2020-02-25HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 208: yeas 94, nays 0
2020-02-24HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-20HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-02-18HouseRepresentatives Pressel, Lauer, Moseley added as cosponsors
2020-02-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2020-01-28SenateReferred to the House
2020-01-27SenateSenator Buck added as coauthor
2020-01-27SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Soliday
2020-01-27SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 59: yeas 50, nays 0
2020-01-23SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-21SenateSenator Doriot added as third author
2020-01-21SenateSenator Garten added as second author
2020-01-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-06SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2020-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Koch

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/senate/197/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/c/d/bdcd1300/SB0197.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/8/e/668e4c25/SB0197.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/c/8/11c832ca/SB0197.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/d/7/70d76700/SB0197.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/8/6/4286861c/SB0197.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/0/4/a504b9ae/SB0197.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/6/c/f06c3eef/SB0197.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/9/7/cc978716/SB0197.01.INTR.07.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/1/0/66102515/SB0197.59_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/2/d/a22dcc9c/SB0197.02.COMS.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/a/f/48af3eaa/SB0197.208_H.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback