IN SB0197 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 159
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Various property issues. Amends the statute concerning the Indiana coordinate system for describing real property to provide that coordinates based on specified coordinate systems and used to define the position of a point on a land boundary may not be presented to be recorded unless the recording document also contains: (1) the method used to relate the coordinates to the National Spatial Reference System; and (2) the name and zone of the coordinate system. Eliminates other reporting and certification requirements with respect to such recordings. Provides that if any coordinates (not specifically coordinates based on the Indiana coordinate system, as

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various property issues. Amends the statute concerning the Indiana coordinate system for describing real property to provide that coordinates based on specified coordinate systems and used to define the position of a point on a land boundary may not be presented to be recorded unless the recording document also contains: (1) the method used to relate the coordinates to the National Spatial Reference System; and (2) the name and zone of the coordinate system. Eliminates other reporting and certification requirements with respect to such recordings. Provides that if any coordinates (not specifically coordinates based on the Indiana coordinate system, as

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21SenatePublic Law 159
2018-03-21SenateSigned by the Governor
2018-03-20SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2018-03-13SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2018-03-12SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 375: yeas 44, nays 0
2018-03-08SenateMotion to concur filed
2018-03-08SenateDissent rescinded
2018-03-07HouseHouse advisors appointed: Bartels and Hatfield
2018-03-07HouseHouse conferees appointed: Ober and Bauer
2018-03-07SenateSenate advisors appointed: Walker, Lanane and Buck
2018-03-07SenateSenate conferees appointed: Doriot and Randolph Lonnie M
2018-03-07SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2018-03-07SenateMotion to dissent filed
2018-03-05SenateConcurrence withdrawn
2018-03-05SenateMotion to concur filed
2018-03-02HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2018-03-01HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 280: yeas 94, nays 0
2018-02-28HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2018-02-26HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-02-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-01-26SenateReferred to the House
2018-01-23SenateSenator Walker added as second author
2018-01-23SenateCosponsors: Representatives Morris and Friend
2018-01-23SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Ober
2018-01-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 58: yeas 49, nays 0
2018-01-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2018-01-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
2018-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Doriot

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2018/bills/senate/197/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/9/a/849abbff/SB0197.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/0/e/d30e9a43/SB0197.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/f/c/26fcbbfc/SB0197.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/d/2/0bd2e16b/SB0197.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/b/b/2bbb4b56/SB0197.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/f/1/f3f1a42a/SB0197.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/4/d/d/24dd63b1/SB0197.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/a/1/7/ba173767/SB0197.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/5/c/985c1091/SB0197.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/7/9/1a794ff0/SB0197.58.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/6/7/d1670c6a/SB0197.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/9/f/d39ff75b/SB0197.280.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/b/6/b1b646bd/SB0197.375.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback