IN SB0197 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Public Law 76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Chauffeur's license exemption. Authorizes an individual to transport: (1) a recreational vehicle; or (2) a towing vehicle and recreational vehicle; without a chauffeur's license in certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chauffeur's license exemption. Authorizes an individual to transport: (1) a recreational vehicle; or (2) a towing vehicle and recreational vehicle; without a chauffeur's license in certain circumstances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-29SenatePublic Law 76
2015-04-29SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-04-27SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-09SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-04-07SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 385: yeas 48, nays 0
2015-03-31SenateMotion to concur filed
2015-03-18HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2015-03-17HouseRepresentative Forestal added as cosponsor
2015-03-17HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 292: yeas 94, nays 0
2015-03-16HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-03-12HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-02HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2015-02-03SenateReferred to the House
2015-01-22SenateRepresentatives Miller D and Culver added as cosponsors
2015-01-22SenateRepresentative Soliday added as sponsor
2015-01-22SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 24: yeas 49, nays 0
2015-01-20SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2015-01-20SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-01-15SenateSenator Glick added as second author
2015-01-13SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-06SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation
2015-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Yoder

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/197/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/c/6/3dc62a1c/SB0197.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/d/5/b5d5f31e/SB0197.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/f/9/d4f96066/SB0197.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/3/f/c43f6019/SB0197.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/e/7/9ee72b4d/SB0197.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/9/5/4b959f62/SB0197.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/8/f/ab8fdeac/SB0197.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/f/2/0ff2b03f/SB0197.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/9/b/959b0198/SB0197.24.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/2/5/dd25bb1b/SB0197.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/4/d/694d0b94/SB0197.292.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/0/2/e502bd6a/SB0197.385.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback