IN SB0194 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Obstruction of traffic. Increases the penalty for obstruction of traffic under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Obstruction of traffic.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2021-02-03SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-02SenateSenator Tomes added as coauthor
2021-02-02SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Schaibley
2021-02-02SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 48: yeas 45, nays 2
2021-02-01SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-28SenateSenators Young M and Freeman added as coauthors
2021-01-28SenateSenator Walker K added as coauthor
2021-01-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-25SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2021-01-25SenateSenator Sandlin added as third author
2021-01-25SenateSenator Koch added as second author
2021-01-25SenateSenator Koch removed as coauthor
2021-01-14SenateSenator Koch added as coauthor
2021-01-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2021-01-05SenateAuthored by Senator Baldwin

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/194/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/5/3/7353b9ab/SB0194.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/8/2/7882fb17/SB0194.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/b/c/40bc88c6/SB0194.02.COMS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/a/4/29a464a7/SB0194.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/9/e/cb9e1de8/SB0194.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/c/9/14c951c5/SB0194.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/3/1/4231e789/SB0194.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/3/0/0e30c22c/SB0194.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/3/c/523c45f3/SB0194.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/c/f/d6cf1f9b/SB0194.48_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback