IN SB0190 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-25 - Public Law 202
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-25 - Public Law 202
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health facility certificate of need. Requires the office of the secretary of family and social services to cooperate with the state department of health (state department) in the provision of certain health facility information. Amends the expiration of statutes placing certain limitations on the licensure of comprehensive care health facilities and the licensure of comprehensive care beds to the date upon which certain administrative rules take effect. Establishes a comprehensive care health facility certificate of need program administered by the state department. Sets forth certificate of need application requirements and exemptions. Urges the interim study of whether unused or underused
Title
Health facility certificate of need. Requires the office of the secretary of family and social services to cooperate with the state department of health (state department) in the provision of certain health facility information. Amends the expiration of statutes placing certain limitations on the licensure of comprehensive care health facilities and the licensure of comprehensive care beds to the date upon which certain administrative rules take effect. Establishes a comprehensive care health facility certificate of need program administered by the state department. Sets forth certificate of need application requirements and exemptions. Urges the interim study of whether unused or underused
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Mishler [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Timothy Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 74 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 74 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-25 | Senate | Public Law 202 |
2018-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 374: yeas 40, nays 4 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2018-03-01 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2018-02-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 267: yeas 74, nays 18 |
2018-02-26 | House | Amendment #2 (Miller D) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-26 | House | Amendment #1 (Eberhart) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-26 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-02-22 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-19 | House | Representative Huston removed as cosponsor |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Huston |
2018-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Brown T |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 167: yeas 42, nays 5 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski removed as coauthor |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senator Becker added as coauthor |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Mishler |