IN SB0190 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the legislative council to assign to the Indiana child custody and support advisory committee the task of studying the termination of parenting rights of an individual with a child who was conceived as a result of an act of rape by the individual.
Title
Study of terminating parenting rights.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. Richard Bray [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] |
Sen. Doug Eckerty [R] | Sen. Patricia Miller [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-14 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-13 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-13 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-09 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 341: yeas 50, nays 0 | |
2012-03-08 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 386: yeas 91, nays 0 | |
2012-03-08 | Rules suspended | |
2012-03-08 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2012-03-01 | House advisors appointed: Ellspermann, McMillin and Pierce | |
2012-03-01 | House conferees appointed: Kubacki and L. Lawson | |
2012-02-29 | Senate advisors appointed: Bray, Steele and Randolph | |
2012-02-29 | Senate conferee appointed: Charbonneau and Lanane | |
2012-02-28 | Senate dissented from House amendments | |
2012-02-27 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2012-02-27 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 237: yeas 99, nays 0 | |
2012-02-23 | Representative Riecken removed as cosponsor | |
2012-02-23 | Amendment 1 (McMillin), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-23 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-21 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-13 | Representative Riecken added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-31 | Senators Becker and Miller added as coauthors | |
2012-01-31 | Senator Alting added as coauthor | |
2012-01-31 | Senator Eckerty added as coauthor | |
2012-01-31 | Cosponsor: Rep. Ellspermann | |
2012-01-31 | House sponsor: Rep. Kubacki | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 120: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-01-30 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-26 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-25 | Senator Steele added as third author | |
2012-01-19 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | |
2012-01-19 | Senator Bray added as second author | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senator Charbonneau |