IN SB0189 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 64
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Emergency communication disorder permits. Allows the department of education to issue an emergency communication disorder permit to an individual to serve the needs of certain students who are eligible for speech and language services. Provides that the director of a graduate program in communication disorders shall confirm to the department of education that an individual is complying with certain emergency communication disorder permit requirements. Requires the Indiana professional licensing agency, in consultation with the department of education, the office of educator effectiveness and licensing, the Indiana Council of Administrators of Special Education (ICASE), the Indiana Association of Public School Superintendents (IAPSS), the speech-language pathology and audiology board, and the Indiana Speech-Language-Hearing Association (ISHA) to: (1) examine the requirements for licensure as a speech-language pathologist or audiologist in Indiana; and (2) not later than July 1, 2020, issue to the general assembly a report containing recommendations for streamlining the process for obtaining a license as a speech-language pathologist or audiologist in Indiana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency communication disorder permits. Allows the department of education to issue an emergency communication disorder permit to an individual to serve the needs of certain students who are eligible for speech and language services. Provides that the director of a graduate program in communication disorders shall confirm to the department of education that an individual is complying with certain emergency communication disorder permit requirements. Requires the Indiana professional licensing agency, in consultation with the department of education, the office of educator effectiveness and licensing, the Indiana Council of Administrators of Special Education (ICASE), the Indiana Association of Public School Superintendents (IAPSS), the speech-language pathology and audiology board, and the Indiana Speech-Language-Hearing Association (ISHA) to: (1) examine the requirements for licensure as a speech-language pathologist or audiologist in Indiana; and (2) not later than July 1, 2020, issue to the general assembly a report containing recommendations for streamlining the process for obtaining a license as a speech-language pathologist or audiologist in Indiana.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenatePublic Law 64
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-02HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-02SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-03-28SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 344: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-03-28SenateSenator Rogers added as coauthor
2019-03-27SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-03-20HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-03-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 323: yeas 69, nays 26
2019-03-18HouseAmendment #1 (Campbell) prevailed; voice vote
2019-03-18HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-04HouseRepresentative Clere added as cosponsor
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2019-01-25SenateReferred to the House
2019-01-24SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Cook
2019-01-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 29: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-01-22SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2019-01-22SenateAmendment #1 (Spartz) prevailed; voice vote
2019-01-22SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-01-17SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-03SenateSenator Melton added as coauthor
2019-01-03SenateSenator Raatz added as third author
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senators Becker and Leising

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/189/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/1/b/ea1b6518/SB0189.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/5/3/ca53b0c0/SB0189.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/c/8/15c846b3/SB0189.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/2/a/6d2a212e/SB0189.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/4/6/7/2467d4b3/SB0189.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/9/4/b7940d16/SB0189.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/c/4/0cc4be62/SB0189.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/3/5/87350cec/SB0189.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/b/4/0bb4cf59/SB0189.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/2/8/5/9285ee75/SB0189.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/a/5/dfa53490/SB0189.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/3/8/7b38c0f4/SB0189.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/8/8/4f88a68d/SB0189.29.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/c/7/f6c755a3/SB0189.03.ENGS.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/9/4/44942b89/SB0189.323.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/f/7/05f7db93/SB0189.344.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback