IN SB0183 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 32
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 32
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Real property offenses. Amends the statute concerning criminal trespass to specify that a person commits criminal trespass if the person knowingly or intentionally enters or refuses to leave the real property of another person after having been prohibited from entering or asked to leave the real property by a law enforcement officer when the real property is: (1) vacant real property or a vacant structure (both as defined by the statute concerning the abatement of vacant structures and abandoned structures); or (2) designated by a municipality or county enforcement authority to be abandoned property or an abandoned structure. Provides that
Title
Real property offenses. Amends the statute concerning criminal trespass to specify that a person commits criminal trespass if the person knowingly or intentionally enters or refuses to leave the real property of another person after having been prohibited from entering or asked to leave the real property by a law enforcement officer when the real property is: (1) vacant real property or a vacant structure (both as defined by the statute concerning the abatement of vacant structures and abandoned structures); or (2) designated by a municipality or county enforcement authority to be abandoned property or an abandoned structure. Provides that
Sponsors
Sen. Rodric Bray [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] |
Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Rep. John Price [R] | Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D] |
Rep. Justin Moed [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | Public Law 32 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 345: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2016-03-01 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2016-03-01 | House | Representative Moed added as cosponsor |
2016-03-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 299: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2016-02-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-22 | House | Representative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor |
2016-02-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as coauthor |
2016-01-21 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Price |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 40: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as coauthor |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as third author |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Senator Steele added as second author |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bray |