IN SB0179 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Amendment #2 (Gaskill) prevailed; voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Amendment #2 (Gaskill) prevailed; voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
County commissioner districts. Requires all county commissioner districts to contain, as nearly as possible, equal population and compact boundaries (currently, equal population and compactness requirements apply to only Lake County and St. Joseph County). Specifies ordinance or resolution requirements for the division of the county districts and provides for the severability of the ordinance or resolution.
Title
County commissioner districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Gaskill) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senator Walker G added as second author |
2021-01-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Gaskill |