IN SB0178 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - House advisors appointed: Bosma, Lehman, Steuerwald, Boy, Moseley and Pfaff
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Various election matters. Requires the election division instead of the Indiana election commission to prescribe a uniform generic seal for use on certain ballots when the circuit court clerk is a candidate on the ballot. Provides that a candidate for the office of attorney general may not have been disbarred in Indiana or suspended from the practice of law in Indiana for at least 30 days without automatic reinstatement at any time during the period of five years before taking office. Provides that if the individual who holds the office of attorney general is disbarred in Indiana or suspended from the practice of law in Indiana for at least 30 days, the individual forfeits the office and a vacancy in the office exists. Requires certification by the county chairman of a candidate in a political party primary or town convention if the candidate cast a nonpartisan ballot at the most recent primary election in which the candidate voted beginning in January, 2021. Updates municipal primary dates. Prohibits the printing of an independent or political party device on a ballot under specified circumstances. Specifies ballot placement of names when there are both at-large and district candidates. Specifies that language in a public question not contain beginning and ending quotation marks. Adds references to the Porter County election board. Adds references to instances in which an absentee ballot may be recast. Adds references to vote centers. Specifies a procedure for folding ballots when voting in front of an absentee voter board. Specifies a comparison of signature upon receipt of an absentee ballot and time frame. Sets forth a procedure if a county election board does not unanimously determine that an absentee ballot signature is genuine. States that the position of an absentee ballot counter or a provisional ballot counter is not a lucrative office for purposes of the state Constitution. Authorizes the secretary of state to establish a pilot program during the May, 2020 primary for testing of a voting system. Requires precinct returns to be sent to the director of the board of elections and registration if the counting location is outside the county. Allows a member of the Indiana election commission to appoint a proxy, and specifies the process and limitations. Adds a Level 6 felony for inducing or procuring another person to vote or refrain from voting for or against a candidate or public question at: (1) a caucus; or (2) the appointment of a candidate by a political party chairman or central committee officer; by giving, offering, or promising a person money or other property. Changes certification of a question on a referendum from 60 days to 74 days. Repeals language concerning absentee ballots (moving some language to central voting statutes) and repeals certain absentee voter boards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various election matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Wesco) prevailed (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseHouse advisors appointed: Bosma, Lehman, Steuerwald, Boy, Moseley and Pfaff
2020-03-11HouseHouse conferees appointed: Wesco and Dvorak
2020-03-10SenateSenator Crane removed as third author
2020-03-10SenateSenator Ford Jon removed as second author
2020-03-10SenateSenate advisors appointed: Ford Jon and Breaux
2020-03-10SenateSenate conferees appointed: Messmer and Randolph Lonnie M
2020-03-05SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2020-03-05SenateMotion to dissent filed
2020-03-04HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2020-03-03HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 285: yeas 83, nays 13
2020-03-02HouseRepresentative Manning added as cosponsor
2020-03-02HouseRepresentative Judy removed as cosponsor
2020-03-02HouseAmendment #1 (Wesco) prevailed; Roll Call 244: yeas 84, nays 9
2020-03-02HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-27HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-17HouseReferred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures pursuant to House Rule 84
2020-02-17HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
2020-02-04SenateReferred to the House
2020-02-03SenateCosponsor: Representative Judy
2020-02-03SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Wesco
2020-02-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 116: yeas 47, nays 0
2020-01-30SenateSenator Grooms added as coauthor
2020-01-30SenateSenator Crane added as third author
2020-01-30SenateSenator Ford Jon added as second author
2020-01-30SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-06SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections
2020-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Walker

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/senate/178/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/7/8/68789a53/SB0178.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/8/e/298edfcd/SB0178.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/f/f/55ff1f4a/SB0178.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/3/4/e73406f1/SB0178.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/c/1/37c1003e/SB0178.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/6/4/44648506/SB0178.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/2/1/0821b75a/SB0178.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/d/a/6ddaf7c6/SB0178.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/9/d/3f9d76b6/SB0178.05.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/6/0/e360fed6/SB0178.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/6/f/746f462c/SB0178.116_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/9/d/729df743/SB0178.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/a/9/23a93e3f/SB0178.03.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/9/8/9f9846f4/SB0178.244_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/1/8/ab1821f4/SB0178.285_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback