IN SB0178 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Public Law 51
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Public Law 51
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Taking of sand from bed of Lake Michigan. Provides that sand taken from the bed or from under the bed of Lake Michigan pursuant to a permit from the department of natural resources (DNR) may only be deposited on the beach of Lake Michigan and may not be removed to any other place or used for any other purpose. Provides, however, that: (1) if a permittee dredges not more than ten cubic yards of sand from the bed or from under the bed of Lake Michigan within a 30 day period, the permittee is not required to deposit the sand
Title
Taking of sand from bed of Lake Michigan. Provides that sand taken from the bed or from under the bed of Lake Michigan pursuant to a permit from the department of natural resources (DNR) may only be deposited on the beach of Lake Michigan and may not be removed to any other place or used for any other purpose. Provides, however, that: (1) if a permittee dredges not more than ten cubic yards of sand from the bed or from under the bed of Lake Michigan within a 30 day period, the permittee is not required to deposit the sand
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Public Law 51 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-02 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2018-03-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 276: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2018-02-28 | House | Representative Candelaria Reardon added as cosponsor |
2018-02-28 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2018-02-28 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-26 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-19 | House | Representative Eberhart added as cosponsor |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senators Doriot and Melton added as coauthors |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Slager and Moseley |
2018-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Pelath |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 117: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Tallian) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Tallian |