IN SB0178 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the health finance commission to study possible prohibitions on certain insurer and health maintenance organization activities related to outpatient benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Outpatient benefit study.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 100
2011-05-09 Signed by the Governor
2011-05-02 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-27 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-26 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-19 Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 377: yeas 48, nays 0
2011-04-13 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2011-04-08 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2011-04-08 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 427: yeas 88, nays 0
2011-04-07 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-04-04 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
2011-02-22 Cosponsor: Rep. C. Brown
2011-02-22 House sponsor: Rep. T. Brown
2011-02-22 Referred to the House
2011-02-22 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 220: yeas 47 and nays 2
2011-02-21 Senator Becker added as third author
2011-02-21 Senator Gard added as second author
2011-02-21 Amendment 1 (Miller), prevailed;
2011-02-21 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-02-17 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2011-01-05 Authored by Senator Miller

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback