IN SB0177 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 7 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Victim's rights and investigations. Establishes a procedure permitting an immediate family member of a deceased individual to request the superintendent of the state police department to conduct a new investigation into the death of the individual if: (1) a local law enforcement agency has determined that the death was not the result of a criminal act by a third party; (2) the individual was not under the care of a physician or the victim of medical malpractice; and (3) the family member has a reasonable suspicion that the death was the result of a criminal act by a third party.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Victim's rights and investigations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-08SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 375: yeas 47, nays 0
2021-04-07SenateMotion to concur filed
2021-04-07HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-04-06HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 364: yeas 91, nays 0
2021-04-05HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-04-01HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-01HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2021-02-03SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-02SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2021-02-02SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Bartels
2021-02-02SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 47: yeas 47, nays 0
2021-02-01SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-25SenateSenator Young M added as second author
2021-01-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2021-01-05SenateAuthored by Senator Messmer

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/177/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/7/1/68710027/SB0177.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/f/3/96f313bc/SB0177.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/8/0/738029e8/SB0177.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/1/8/4918ff09/SB0177.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/a/a/6faa92b9/SB0177.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/5/4/82548d91/SB0177.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/4/c/844c3227/SB0177.04.ENRH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/7/e/2c7e49b2/SB0177.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/7/9/44791f84/SB0177.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/5/8/9a58ec26/SB0177.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/7/3/6a735750/SB0177.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/f/0/d5f005f7/SB0177.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/b/d/34bdc5be/SB0177.02.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/a/3/eba38a26/SB0177.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/9/5/2195cdea/SB0177.03.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/9/0/1c905c05/SB0177.03.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/c/f/52cffac3/SB0177.03.COMH.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/9/e/fb9e1120/SB0177.04.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/d/7/98d74b5f/SB0177.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/b/d/d5bd7300/SB0177.47_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/9/1/a991c512/SB0177.02.COMS.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/f/9/c8f95daf/SB0177.364_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/9/6/2f96040e/SB0177.375_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback