IN SB0177 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 133
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 133
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage matters. Prohibits the alcohol and tobacco commission (commission) from issuing a beer dealer's permit to a package liquor store unless the proprietor of the package liquor store satisfies Indiana resident ownership requirements. Amends the ownership residency requirements for the issuance of an alcoholic beverage dealer's permit to a corporation, limited partnership, or limited liability company for the premises of a package liquor store. Allows the commission to renew or transfer ownership of an alcoholic beverage dealer's permit of any type for the holder of a dealer's permit who: (1) held the permit for the premises of a package
Title
Alcoholic beverage matters. Prohibits the alcohol and tobacco commission (commission) from issuing a beer dealer's permit to a package liquor store unless the proprietor of the package liquor store satisfies Indiana resident ownership requirements. Amends the ownership residency requirements for the issuance of an alcoholic beverage dealer's permit to a corporation, limited partnership, or limited liability company for the premises of a package liquor store. Allows the commission to renew or transfer ownership of an alcoholic beverage dealer's permit of any type for the holder of a dealer's permit who: (1) held the permit for the premises of a package
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. James Arnold [D] | Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Sen. James Merritt [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Public Law 133 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 367: yeas 43, nays 7 |
2016-03-09 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 411: yeas 92, nays 5 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2016-03-07 | House | House advisors appointed: Ellington and Brown C |
2016-03-07 | House | House conferees appointed: Lehman and GiaQuinta |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Alting, Randolph Lonnie M and Merritt |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Messmer and Arnold J |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Concurrence withdrawn |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2016-03-01 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2016-03-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 298: yeas 87, nays 6 |
2016-02-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-16 | House | Representative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor |
2016-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-02 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lehman |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 131: yeas 42, nays 8 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as coauthor |
2016-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senators Messmer, Arnold J and Alting |