IN SB0176 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requires an applicant for an initial teaching license to be trained and certified in the use of an automated external defibrillator. Requires, after June 30, 2012, an applicant for the renewal of a teaching license to complete training and obtain certification in cardiopulmonary resuscitation, removing a foreign body causing an obstruction in an airway, the Heimlich maneuver, and the use of an automated external defibrillator. Provides that a school nurse, teacher, or other employee of a school is not liable for damages for providing emergency assistance to another person in the course of the nurse's or employee's employment unless the act or omission constitutes gross negligence or willful and wanton misconduct.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher training.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 68 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 146
2011-05-10 Signed by the Governor
2011-05-05 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-05-05 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-05-05 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-29 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 500: yeas 46, nays 4
2011-04-29 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 708: yeas 93, nays 3
2011-04-29 Rules suspended
2011-04-28 Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House
2011-04-27 House advisors appointed: Noe, Clere, DeLaney and Pierce
2011-04-27 House conferees appointed: T. Brown and C. Brown
2011-04-26 Senate advisors appointed: Gard, Mrvan and Yoder
2011-04-26 Senate conferees appointed: Miller and Skinner
2011-04-26 Senate dissented from House amendments
2011-04-19 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2011-04-19 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 563: yeas 68, nays 26
2011-04-18 Amendment 1 (Thompson), prevailed; Division of the House: yeas 58, nays 38
2011-04-18 Amendment 2 (T. Brown), prevailed; voice vote
2011-04-18 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-04-13 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Education
2011-01-25 Senator Breaux added as coauthor
2011-01-25 Cosponsor: Rep. C. Brown
2011-01-25 House sponsor: Rep. T. Brown
2011-01-25 Referred to the House
2011-01-25 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 36: yeas 42 and nays 7
2011-01-24 Senator Skinner added as coauthor
2011-01-24 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-01-20 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-12 Senator Gard added as second author
2011-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2011-01-05 Authored by Senator Miller

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback