IN SB0175 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Operating a vehicle while intoxicated. Provides that a person who causes the death of another person when operating a vehicle with: (1) cocaine; (2) a narcotic drug listed in schedule I or II; or (3) methamphetamine; or its metabolite in the person's blood commits a Level 4 felony.
Title
Operating a vehicle while intoxicated. Provides that a person who causes the death of another person when operating a vehicle with: (1) cocaine; (2) a narcotic drug listed in schedule I or II; or (3) methamphetamine; or its metabolite in the person's blood commits a Level 4 felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-01-24 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative McNamara |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 26: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Randolph Lonnie M) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as second author |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young M |