IN SB0174 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 215
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Fertility fraud and deception. Establishes a cause of action for civil fertility fraud and provides that a prevailing plaintiff may be awarded: (1) compensatory and punitive damages; or (2) liquidated damages of $10,000. Specifies the statute of limitations for civil fertility fraud. Increases the penalty for deception involving the identity of a person or the identity or quantity of property to a Level 6 felony if the offense involves a misrepresentation relating to: (1) a medical procedure, device, or drug; and (2) human reproductive material. Urges the legislative council to assign the topic of fertility laws, including gestational surrogacy, to an appropriate study committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fertility fraud and deception. Establishes a cause of action for civil fertility fraud and provides that a prevailing plaintiff may be awarded: (1) compensatory and punitive damages; or (2) liquidated damages of $10,000. Specifies the statute of limitations for civil fertility fraud. Increases the penalty for deception involving the identity of a person or the identity or quantity of property to a Level 6 felony if the offense involves a misrepresentation relating to: (1) a medical procedure, device, or drug; and (2) human reproductive material. Urges the legislative council to assign the topic of fertility laws, including gestational surrogacy, to an appropriate study committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05SenatePublic Law 215
2019-05-05SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-16SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 510: yeas 44, nays 1
2019-04-10SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-04-09HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-04-08HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 417: yeas 93, nays 0
2019-04-04HouseAmendment #1 (Eberhart) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-04HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-04-02HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-26HouseRepresentative DeLaney added as cosponsor
2019-03-26HouseRepresentative Schaibley added as cosponsor
2019-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-22SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-21SenateCosponsor: Representative Speedy
2019-02-21SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Pressel
2019-02-21SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 173: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-02-19SenateAmendment #6 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-19SenateAmendment #12 (Sandlin) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-19SenateAmendment #8 (Sandlin) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-19SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-01-24SenateSenators Freeman, Buck, Randolph, Taylor G added as coauthors
2019-01-24SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Head added as third author
2019-01-24SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-10SenateSenator Bohacek added as second author
2019-01-10SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Sandlin

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/174/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/2/6/cc26e2e8/SB0174.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/1/3/3f13c5f5/SB0174.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/5/5/cf55d2e6/SB0174.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/b/a/82baef25/SB0174.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/8/8/1188998d/SB0174.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/8/c/d28c6f8b/SB0174.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/d/4/81d4172a/SB0174.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/a/f/d3af2a5a/SB0174.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/0/1/090122db/SB0174.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/2/9/b729ad0f/SB0174.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/3/6/b536354a/SB0174.06.ENRH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/5/3/f6537f36/SB0174.06.ENRH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/6/c/d66c4e90/SB0174.07.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/a/9/c3a982d5/SB0174.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/1/f/b51fd42b/SB0174.173.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/8/4/3484134d/SB0174.03.ENGS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/4/0/a240094d/SB0174.417.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/c/7/aec72bb0/SB0174.510.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback