IN SB0171 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 214
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

State and local administration. Makes the filing deadlines for property tax deductions applicable to mobile homes and manufactured homes that are not assessed as real property the same as the filing deadlines for property tax deductions applicable to real property. Repeals the coal conversion system property tax deduction, the coal combustion product property tax deduction, the recycled coal combustion byproduct personal property tax deduction, the aircraft property tax deduction, the intrastate aircraft property tax deduction, the Hoosier alternative fuel vehicle manufacturer investment income tax credit, and the local income tax option hiring incentive credit. Extends the legislative services agency tax incentive review schedule from five to seven years. Provides that a redevelopment commission or other entity that creates a tax increment financing area shall file the resolution and supporting documents that create the tax increment financing area with both the county auditor in which the tax increment financing area is located and the department of local government finance within 30 days after the redevelopment commission or other entity takes final action on the resolution. Provides that if a redevelopment commission or other entity that creates a tax increment financing area files the resolution and supporting documents with either the county auditor and the department of local government finance after the first anniversary of the effective date of the tax increment financing area, the county auditor shall compute the base assessed value of the tax increment financing area using the assessment date immediately preceding the later of the date on which the documents were filed with the county auditor or the date on which the documents were filed with the department of local government finance. Urges the study of the advisability of eliminating the mortgage property tax deduction and the advisability of increasing the homestead standard deduction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State and local administration. Makes the filing deadlines for property tax deductions applicable to mobile homes and manufactured homes that are not assessed as real property the same as the filing deadlines for property tax deductions applicable to real property. Repeals the coal conversion system property tax deduction, the coal combustion product property tax deduction, the recycled coal combustion byproduct personal property tax deduction, the aircraft property tax deduction, the intrastate aircraft property tax deduction, the Hoosier alternative fuel vehicle manufacturer investment income tax credit, and the local income tax option hiring incentive credit. Extends the legislative services agency tax incentive review schedule from five to seven years. Provides that a redevelopment commission or other entity that creates a tax increment financing area shall file the resolution and supporting documents that create the tax increment financing area with both the county auditor in which the tax increment financing area is located and the department of local government finance within 30 days after the redevelopment commission or other entity takes final action on the resolution. Provides that if a redevelopment commission or other entity that creates a tax increment financing area files the resolution and supporting documents with either the county auditor and the department of local government finance after the first anniversary of the effective date of the tax increment financing area, the county auditor shall compute the base assessed value of the tax increment financing area using the assessment date immediately preceding the later of the date on which the documents were filed with the county auditor or the date on which the documents were filed with the department of local government finance. Urges the study of the advisability of eliminating the mortgage property tax deduction and the advisability of increasing the homestead standard deduction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Campbell) failed (Y: 21 N: 73 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05SenatePublic Law 214
2019-05-05SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-24HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 626: yeas 94, nays 0
2019-04-24SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 588: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-04-23HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-23SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-23SenateSenator Merritt added as conferee
2019-04-23SenateSenator Ford J.D. removed as conferee
2019-04-18HouseHouse advisors appointed: Lehman, Barrett and Pryor
2019-04-18HouseHouse conferees appointed: Huston and Candelaria Reardon
2019-04-18SenateSenate advisors appointed: Houchin, Niezgodski and Koch
2019-04-18SenateSenate conferees appointed: Holdman and Ford J.D.
2019-04-18SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2019-04-17SenateMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-03HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-04-02HouseRepresentative Candelaria Reardon added as cosponsor
2019-04-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 389: yeas 95, nays 0
2019-04-01HouseAmendment #2 (Campbell) failed; Roll Call 379: yeas 21, nays 73
2019-04-01HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-02-13SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-12SenateSenator Koch added as third author
2019-02-12SenateCosponsor: Representative Lehman
2019-02-12SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Huston
2019-02-12SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 107: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-02-11SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2019-02-11SenateSenator Houchin added as second author
2019-02-11SenateAmendment #1 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-11SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-07SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-05SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Holdman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/171/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/a/9/61a94edc/SB0171.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/c/9/dec9fa13/SB0171.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/6/e/326e76e7/SB0171.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/0/f/3c0fe417/SB0171.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/6/6/5566e3f7/SB0171.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/6/3/fe638761/SB0171.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/d/7/7dd77110/SB0171.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/8/9/57890c98/SB0171.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/5/a/d75a8219/SB0171.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/6/7/6d678723/SB0171.107.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/1/5/6/31565b07/SB0171.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/b/f/53bf1afd/SB0171.379.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/7/0/fe70aaf5/SB0171.389.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/a/9/2ea968c7/SB0171.588.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/a/4/9/8a494dd4/SB0171.626.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback