IN SB0171 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Public Law 24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Public Law 24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a community corrections program to develop a plan of collaboration with the county probation department as a condition of receiving financial assistance from the department of correction. Permits the commissioner of the department of correction to award additional financial aid to counties with an approved community supervision collaboration plan. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the criminal law and sentencing policy study committee.)
Title
Community supervision.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. Mark Stoops [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 017102 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Roll Call 017101 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 017102 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Roll Call 017101 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | Senate | Public Law 24 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-02-26 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2014-02-26 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 293: yeas 92 and nays 0 |
2014-02-24 | House | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-20 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Steuerwald added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative McMillin added as sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 150: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Head added as second author. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Corrections & Criminal Law |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young R Michael |