IN SB0167 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 130
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 130
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State higher education institutions. Permits a public benefit corporation to merge with a state higher education institution, without court approval, if the public benefit corporation is controlled by the state higher education institution.
Title
State higher education institutions. Permits a public benefit corporation to merge with a state higher education institution, without court approval, if the public benefit corporation is controlled by the state higher education institution.
Sponsors
Sen. Howard Kenley [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Mark Stoops [D] | Rep. Robert Cherry [R] |
Rep. Timothy Brown [R] | Rep. Gregory Porter [D] | Rep. Sheila Klinker [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Public Law 130 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 328: yeas 42, nays 0 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2016-02-29 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2016-02-29 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 251: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2016-02-25 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-22 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Brown, T., Porter, Klinker |
2016-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Cherry |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 83: yeas 44, nays 6 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Kenley) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2016-01-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kenley |