IN SB0166 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - Representative Messmer added as cosponsor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - Representative Messmer added as cosponsor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a qualified organization may conduct two bingo events each year in which the total prizes may not exceed $30,000 (current law allows the total prizes to not exceed $10,000). Provides that the total prizes awarded for one pull tab, punchboard, or tip board may not exceed $25,000 (current law allows total prizes to not exceed $5,000). Increases the prize limit for a single prize awarded for a winning ticket in a pull tab, punchboard, or tip board game from $599 to $15,000. Removes certain information requirements concerning patrons and prize winners. Requires that a qualified organization may pay for licensed supplies only with a check drawn on or by an electronic funds transfer from the qualified organization's gaming account. Provides that a licensed distributor may obtain licensed supplies to be used in charity gaming only from an entity licensed by the gaming commission as a manufacturer or distributor or from certain qualified organizations.
Title
Charity gaming.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Sen. John Waterman [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Thomas Dermody [R] | Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Public Policy - Roll Call 016601 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Public Policy - Roll Call 016601 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-17 | House | Representative Messmer added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-17 | House | Representative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-17 | House | Representative Dermody added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Public Policy |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Representative VanNatter added as sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 67: yeas 41 and nays 8 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as coauthor |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senator Waterman added as third author. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Senator Alting added as second author. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Public Policy |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leising |