IN SB0166 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that an employee of a county, city, town, or township (unit) is considered to have resigned from employment with the unit if the employee assumes the elected executive office of the unit or becomes an elected member of the unit's legislative or fiscal body. Provides that an employee of a unit: (1) who is elected in the November 2011 municipal election and assumes office on January 1, 2012; or (2) who is serving in an elected office on December 31, 2011; may serve the remainder of the employee's elected term of office. Provides that the restriction does not prohibit an employee of a unit from holding an elected office of a unit other than the unit that employs the government employee.
Title
Local government employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform | |
2011-02-15 | Senators Delph and Schneider added as coauthors | |
2011-02-15 | Cosponsor: Rep. Torr | |
2011-02-15 | House sponsor: Rep. Hinkle | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to the House | |
2011-02-15 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 125: yeas 38 and nays 11 | |
2011-02-14 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-10 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Senator Lawson |