IN SB0162 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-04 - Senate dissented from House amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-04 - Senate dissented from House amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Hospital immunizations. Urges the legislative council to refer to an interim study committee topics concerning hospital immunizations.
Title
Hospital immunizations. Urges the legislative council to refer to an interim study committee topics concerning hospital immunizations.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Miller [R] | Sen. James Arnold [D] | Sen. Frank Mrvan [D] | Sen. Ryan Mishler [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Cindy Kirchhofer [R] | Rep. Charlie Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 76 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2016-03-03 | House | House advisors appointed: Zent, Clere, Brown C and Shackleford |
2016-03-03 | House | House conferees appointed: Kirchhofer and Bauer |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Mishler, Mrvan and Charbonneau |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Miller Patricia and Arnold J |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2016-03-01 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2016-03-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 294: yeas 76, nays 17 |
2016-02-29 | House | Amendment #1 (Shackleford) prevailed; |
2016-02-29 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Brown, C. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Kirchhofer |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 129: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as coauthor |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Senator Mishler added as coauthor |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as third author |
2016-01-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health & Provider Services |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Miller Patricia |