IN SB0159 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 04/28/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that, if the commissioner of the department of environmental management determines that a proposed rule includes an adoption or incorporation by reference of a federal law, regulation, or rule: (1) any part of the proposed rule that corresponds to the federal law, regulation, or rule may not be adopted if after the commissioner's determination the federal law, regulation, or rule on which that part of the proposed rule is based is repealed, is invalidated by judicial, legislative, or regulatory action, or has its enforcement stayed; and (2) the commissioner may not enforce that part of the adopted rule if after the adoption the federal law, regulation, or rule on which that part of the proposed rule is based is repealed, is invalidated by judicial, legislative, or regulatory action, or has its enforcement stayed. Specifies how legislative, administrative, or judicial action related to a federal law, rule, or regulation affects a state rule based on the federal law, rule, or regulation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Streamlined environmental rule making procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Wolkins), prevailed (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 04/28/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 79
2011-04-28 Signed by the Governor
2011-04-20 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-19 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-18 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-14 Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 352: yeas 49, nays 0
2011-04-11 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2011-04-08 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2011-04-08 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 425: yeas 89, nays 0
2011-04-07 Amendment 1 (Wolkins), prevailed; Roll Call 416: yeas 85, nays 9
2011-04-07 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-04-04 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
2011-02-15 House sponsor: Rep. Wolkins
2011-02-15 Referred to the House
2011-02-15 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 124: yeas 49 and nays 0
2011-02-14 Amendment 2 (Gard), prevailed;
2011-02-14 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-02-10 Senator Tallian added as coauthor
2011-02-10 Senator Charbonneau added as second author
2011-02-08 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Energy and Environmental Affairs
2011-01-05 Authored by Senator Gard

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2011&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0159
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/IN/IN0159.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SB/SB0159.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SB/SB0159.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/ES/ES0159.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/ES/ES0159.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SE/SE0159.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Srollcal/0124.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0416.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0425.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Srollcal/0352.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback