IN SB0158 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-05 - Second reading: ordered engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-05 - Second reading: ordered engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Ordinances. Requires the health and hospital corporation of Marion County to post notice of an ordinance pending final action on the corporation's official Internet web site.
Title
Ordinances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Pressel |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 176: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Bohacek) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senator Young M added as second author |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Bohacek) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as author |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senator Bray removed as author |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bray |