IN SB0157 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - Senator Crane removed as coauthor
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - Senator Crane removed as coauthor
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Real world career readiness program. Establishes the real world career readiness program (program). Provides that the state board of education (state board) shall establish the program to provide a real world career readiness student with career and technical education credentials necessary to transition from school to the workforce. Provides that the state board, in consultation with the department of workforce development, may create an authorized program, or approve high or moderate value career and technical education programs administered by one or more school corporations or charter schools. Provides that a real world career readiness student may attend an authorized program
Title
Real world career readiness program. Establishes the real world career readiness program (program). Provides that the state board of education (state board) shall establish the program to provide a real world career readiness student with career and technical education credentials necessary to transition from school to the workforce. Provides that the state board, in consultation with the department of workforce development, may create an authorized program, or approve high or moderate value career and technical education programs administered by one or more school corporations or charter schools. Provides that a real world career readiness student may attend an authorized program
Sponsors
Sen. John Ruckelshaus [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Sen. Eddie Melton [D] |
Sen. Eric Bassler [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senator Crane removed as coauthor |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senators Crane and Bassler added as coauthors |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senator Melton added as coauthor |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Niezgodski |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senators Ruckelshaus and Kruse |