IN SB0155 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department to release a judgment if: (1) it has been fully satisfied; or (2) the tax assessment or issuance of the tax warrant was erroneous. Provides that a tax lien on real property is void if the person owing the tax provides written notice to the department to file an action to foreclose the lien, and the department fails to file an action to foreclose the lien not later than 180 days after receiving the notice. Permits a sheriff to collect the outstanding tax liability if the taxpayer has taken an action to foreclose the lien. Specifies that a complaint to foreclose a homeowners association lien may not be filed earlier than 90 days after recording, unless a person files a notice to foreclose the lien, or another person files an action to foreclose the property that is the subject of the lien.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax liens.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - House - Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted, passed (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 99
2011-05-09 Signed by the Governor
2011-05-02 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-29 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-28 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-25 Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 460: yeas 50, nays 0
2011-04-20 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2011-04-18 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2011-04-18 Amendment 2 ( Foley) and prevailed; voice vote
2011-04-18 Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted, passed; Roll Call 546: yeas 61, nays 36
2011-04-13 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-04-11 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2011-01-24 Cosponsor: Rep. Ubelhor
2011-01-24 House sponsor: Rep. Foley
2011-01-24 Referred to the House
2011-01-24 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 22: yeas 49 and nays 1
2011-01-20 Senator Randolph added as coauthor
2011-01-20 Senator Tallian added as second author
2011-01-20 Amendment 1 (Tallian), prevailed;
2011-01-20 Amendment 2 (Steele), prevailed;
2011-01-20 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-01-13 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2011-01-05 Authored by Senator Steele

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback