IN SB0147 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-16)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-16)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School emergency response systems. Requires the department of homeland security (department) to establish minimum standards and approve best practices not later than July 1, 2017, for a school emergency response system. Defines the term "emergency response system". Defines the term "school property". Requires the department to establish emergency response system guidelines with input from the division of school building safety.
Title
School emergency response systems. Requires the department of homeland security (department) to establish minimum standards and approve best practices not later than July 1, 2017, for a school emergency response system. Defines the term "emergency response system". Defines the term "school property". Requires the department to establish emergency response system guidelines with input from the division of school building safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | Public Law 27 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 344: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2016-02-29 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2016-02-29 | House | Representative Forestal added as cosponsor |
2016-02-29 | House | Representatives Zent, Klinker, Goodin, Cook, Saunders, Smith, V., Pelath, Beumer, Heaton, McNamara, Kirchhofer, Morris, Lehman, Austin, Wright, Errington, Moseley, Stemler, Brown, C., Lawson, Frye, Ziemke, Karickhoff, Clere, Eberhart, Dermody, Judy, Borders, Arnold, Carbaugh, Gutwein, Soliday added as cosponsors |
2016-02-29 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2016-02-29 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 277: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2016-02-25 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-23 | House | Representative Macer added as cosponsor |
2016-02-23 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-22 | House | Representative Price added as cosponsor |
2016-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senator Miller, Pat added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Truitt |
2016-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Mahan |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 81: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as coauthor |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as third author |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as second author |
2016-01-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |