IN SB0146 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Makes changes to the priority of individuals who may determine the final disposition of the remains of a decedent. Provides that if a person does not exercise a right to determine final disposition within 72 hours of notification of the death of the decedent, the person forfeits the person's right to determine the final disposition of the decedent, and the right to determine final disposition passes to the next person listed in priority. Allows a crematory, cemetery, or funeral home that agrees to shelter the remains of a decedent while parties are in dispute as to the final disposition of the decedent to collect fees for storing the remains of the decedent. Requires that certain causes of action must be filed in the county where the decedent was a resident. Provides that a cemetery or funeral home that relies in good faith on a signed authorization for the cremation, interment, entombment, or inurnment of human remains is not liable for carrying out the disposition of the decedent in accordance with the instructions in the authorization. (Current law provides cemetery owners immunity for making a final disposition under a written authorization unless the cemetery owner has actual notice that the authorization is untrue.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disposition and interment of human remains.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 34
2011-04-20 Signed by the Governor
2011-04-15 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-13 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-12 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-08 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2011-04-08 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 456: yeas 86, nays 0
2011-04-07 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-04-05 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2011-01-31 House sponsor: Rep. Foley
2011-01-31 Referred to the House
2011-01-31 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 54: yeas 49 and nays 0
2011-01-27 Senator Tomes added as coauthor
2011-01-27 Amendment 4 (Taylor), prevailed;
2011-01-27 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-01-24 Senator Mishler added as second author
2011-01-24 Senator Mishler removed as coauthor
2011-01-20 Senator Taylor added as coauthor
2011-01-20 Senator Lanane added as coauthor
2011-01-18 Senator Mishler added as coauthor
2011-01-18 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters
2011-01-05 Authored by Senator Steele

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback