IN SB0144 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 110
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Vehicle weight. Allows the Indiana department of transportation and certain local authorities to issue a permit that allows for the transportation of: (1) material; (2) products; or (3) equipment; belonging to an electric cooperative in certain instances. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying overweight divisible loads. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying: (1) the use of automated traffic control systems in work zones; and (2) the use of special signaling devices on construction vehicles in critical work zones.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle weight. Allows the Indiana department of transportation and certain local authorities to issue a permit that allows for the transportation of: (1) material; (2) products; or (3) equipment; belonging to an electric cooperative in certain instances. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying overweight divisible loads. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying: (1) the use of automated traffic control systems in work zones; and (2) the use of special signaling devices on construction vehicles in critical work zones.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenatePublic Law 110
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-17SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 516: yeas 47, nays 0
2019-04-15SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-04-11HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-04-10HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 454: yeas 93, nays 1
2019-04-08HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2019-02-20SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-18SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2019-02-18SenateCosponsor: Representative Morrison
2019-02-18SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Pressel
2019-02-18SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 138: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-02-14SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-14SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-12SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-28SenateSenator Bassler added as second author
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Ford Jon

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/144/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/f/0/adf01ae8/SB0144.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/0/8/63080ef7/SB0144.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/9/f/919f19fb/SB0144.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/5/7/e7573a5d/SB0144.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/3/8/61385764/SB0144.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/8/c/078c5bce/SB0144.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/e/e/e5ee9845/SB0144.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/8/7/8887524d/SB0144.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/b/1/43b13cac/SB0144.138.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/c/4/9fc43f1a/SB0144.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/e/e/d7ee390f/SB0144.454.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/a/d/54ad0977/SB0144.516.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback