IN SB0141 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Returned to the Senate with amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Office based opioid treatment providers. Specifies requirements that a health care provider that prescribes for a patient in an office based opioid treatment setting must meet in the treatment of the patient. Requires the medical licensing board of Indiana, in consultation with the state department of health and the office of the secretary of family and social services, to adopt rules or protocols concerning office based opioid treatment providers and: (1) treatment agreements; (2) periodic scheduled patient visits; (3) urine toxicology screenings; (4) HIV, hepatitis B, and hepatitis C testing; and (5) the medical record documentation required for the prescribing of buprenorphine over a specified dosage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office based opioid treatment providers. Specifies requirements that a health care provider that prescribes for a patient in an office based opioid treatment setting must meet in the treatment of the patient. Requires the medical licensing board of Indiana, in consultation with the state department of health and the office of the secretary of family and social services, to adopt rules or protocols concerning office based opioid treatment providers and: (1) treatment agreements; (2) periodic scheduled patient visits; (3) urine toxicology screenings; (4) HIV, hepatitis B, and hepatitis C testing; and (5) the medical record documentation required for the prescribing of buprenorphine over a specified dosage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-03-12HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 307: yeas 92, nays 0
2019-03-11HouseRepresentatives Davisson and Fleming added as cosponsors
2019-03-11HouseAmendment #3 (Fleming) prevailed; voice vote
2019-03-11HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-03-07HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2019-01-25SenateReferred to the House
2019-01-24SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Zay added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Bassler added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Smaltz
2019-01-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 24: yeas 42, nays 6
2019-01-22SenateSenator Charbonneau added as second author
2019-01-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-17SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Houchin

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/141/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/b/1/b3b1a65b/SB0141.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/b/b/65bb93a3/SB0141.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/3/0/cf300b28/SB0141.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/8/7/50870e6d/SB0141.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/7/8/367839cb/SB0141.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/d/6/1bd67582/SB0141.04.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/6/6/d8663716/SB0141.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/0/c/860c63ff/SB0141.24.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/7/4/9e74d764/SB0141.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/b/8/a9b896cd/SB0141.307.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback