IN SB0139 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Public Law 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adult guardianship services. Combines the volunteer advocates for seniors program and the volunteer advocates for incapacitated adults programs into one program. Requires that, in submitting a progress report to the court, a volunteer advocate for seniors and incapacitated adults shall include a person centered care plan in the progress report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adult guardianship services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenatePublic Law 4
2020-03-11SenateSigned by the Governor
2020-03-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-03HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-02SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-02-25HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2020-02-24HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 195: yeas 95, nays 0
2020-02-20HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-17HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-02-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-02-05SenateReferred to the House
2020-02-04SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2020-02-04SenateCosponsors: Representatives Bauer and Hamilton
2020-02-04SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Cook
2020-02-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 139: yeas 49, nays 0
2020-02-03SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-30SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2020-01-30SenateSenators Buck, Freeman, Rogers, Glick added as coauthors
2020-01-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-27SenateSenator Koch added as third author
2020-01-27SenateSenator Becker added as second author
2020-01-16SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2020-01-06SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Lanane

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/senate/139/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/d/4/9bd443a3/SB0139.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/6/a/816aaa06/SB0139.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/2/a/422a21c8/SB0139.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/0/4/48049417/SB0139.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/4/d/624d47ad/SB0139.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/f/1/20f1803e/SB0139.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/4/9/e0499d10/SB0139.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/c/d/eacda604/SB0139.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/a/5/d/0a5dbd72/SB0139.139_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/1/4/111437cd/SB0139.02.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/c/5/70c53146/SB0139.195_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback