IN SB0133 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Protective orders and employment. Provides that an employer may not terminate an employee or discriminate against an employee with respect to compensation, benefits, or terms and conditions of employment based on the filing by the employee of a petition for a protective order, whether or not the order has been issued.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protective orders and employment. Provides that an employer may not terminate an employee or discriminate against an employee with respect to compensation, benefits, or terms and conditions of employment based on the filing by the employee of a petition for a protective order, whether or not the order has been issued.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Pensions & Labor - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-02HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2015-02-19SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-16SenateRepresentatives Slager, Soliday, Harris, Fine added as cosponsors
2015-02-16SenateRepresentative Brown, C. added as sponsor
2015-02-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 157: yeas 31, nays 19
2015-02-12SenateSenator Boots added as second author
2015-02-12SenateAmendment #1 (Walker) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-12SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-02-05SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-06SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Pensions & Labor
2015-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Randolph

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback