IN SB0131 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

National motto in schools. Provides that each school corporation and charter school may place a durable poster or framed picture representing: (1) the national motto of the United States, "In God We Trust"; (2) an accurate representation of the United States flag; and (3) an accurate representation of the Indiana state flag; in each school library and classroom within the school corporation or charter school. Provides that the representation of the United States flag and the Indiana state flag must comply with any applicable federal or state laws concerning the design, dimensions, or presentation of each respective flag.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National motto in schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2020-01-29SenateReferred to the House
2020-01-28SenateSenators Koch and Young M added as coauthors
2020-01-28SenateCosponsor: Representative Wesco
2020-01-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Burton
2020-01-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 68: yeas 42, nays 8
2020-01-27SenateSenator Tomes added as second author
2020-01-27SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-06SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2020-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Kruse

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback