IN SB0128 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Public Law 229
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Regional infrastructure improvement projects. Provides that the Indiana finance authority (IFA), rather than the budget agency, administers the local infrastructure revolving loan funds (loan funds). Expands the types of entities that may participate in the loan funds. Authorizes the IFA to issue its bonds to carry out the loan funds. Expands the types of infrastructure that are eligible for the loan funds to include bridges or other public ways. Provides that a regional development authority (RDA) may apply for a "FASTLANE" grant from the Federal Highway Administration (or a grant from any other federal program) for highway funding. Authorizes an

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regional infrastructure improvement projects. Provides that the Indiana finance authority (IFA), rather than the budget agency, administers the local infrastructure revolving loan funds (loan funds). Expands the types of entities that may participate in the loan funds. Authorizes the IFA to issue its bonds to carry out the loan funds. Expands the types of infrastructure that are eligible for the loan funds to include bridges or other public ways. Provides that a regional development authority (RDA) may apply for a "FASTLANE" grant from the Federal Highway Administration (or a grant from any other federal program) for highway funding. Authorizes an

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28SenatePublic Law 229
2017-04-28SenateSigned by the Governor
2017-04-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-21HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-21SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-21HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 528: yeas 98, nays 1
2017-04-21SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 501: yeas 44, nays 6
2017-04-20HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2017-04-20SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2017-04-20SenateSenator Tallian added as conferee
2017-04-20SenateSenator Melton removed as conferee
2017-04-19SenateSenate advisors appointed: Kenley, Niezgodski and Crider
2017-04-19SenateSenate conferees appointed: Messmer and Melton
2017-04-18HouseHouse advisors appointed: Slager, Soliday, Pressel, Bauer, Candelaria Reardon, Harris and Moseley
2017-04-18HouseHouse conferees appointed: Braun and Dvorak
2017-04-17SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2017-04-17SenateMotion to dissent filed
2017-04-17SenateConcurrence withdrawn
2017-04-11SenateMotion to concur filed
2017-04-05HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2017-04-04HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 371: yeas 90, nays 7
2017-04-03HouseAmendment #1 (Braun) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-03HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-03-30HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2017-03-27HouseRepresentative Frye added as cosponsor
2017-03-21HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2017-03-21HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2017-02-28SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-27SenateCosponsor: Representative Soliday
2017-02-27SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Braun
2017-02-27SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 194: yeas 47, nays 2
2017-02-23SenateSenator Crider added as third author
2017-02-23SenateSenator Kenley added as second author
2017-02-23SenateSenator Crider removed as second author
2017-02-23SenateAmendment #1 (Bohacek) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-23SenateReread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-21SenatePlaced back on second reading
2017-02-21SenateSenator Doriot added as coauthor
2017-02-21SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-02-20SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-16SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-13SenateSenator Melton added as coauthor
2017-02-13SenateSenator Crider added as second author
2017-01-23SenateSenator Niezgodski added as coauthor
2017-01-17SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2017-01-04SenateAuthored by Senator Messmer

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/128/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/3/6/4f36337d/SB0128.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/7/0/a670414d/SB0128.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/e/6/afe67d01/SB0128.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/e/9/12e94c63/SB0128.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/5/3/1353f40f/SB0128.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/4/8/a44819ea/SB0128.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/b/b/43bb4dac/SB0128.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/e/8/27e8044b/SB0128.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/e/0/cce03ff5/SB0128.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/7/a/227a975b/SB0128.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/3/b/333b755e/SB0128.06.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/a/9/f0a9bc53/SB0128.06.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/f/6/5df68a0c/SB0128.07.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/7/8/0e78c404/SB0128.07.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/1/8/f7180bc0/SB0128.08.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/3/7/df373c69/SB0128.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/a/4/0fa41379/SB0128.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/d/0/54d0b865/SB0128.194.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/6/d/e46dd11c/SB0128.04.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/4/3/c5434db4/SB0128.05.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/7/0/49703345/SB0128.371.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/3/a/6e3aecbd/SB0128.528.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/4/1/ee410b87/SB0128.501.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback