IN SB0126 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 208
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Political subdivision information on the Internet. Requires local governments and school corporations to provide information for posting on the Indiana transparency Internet web site (transparency web site) as follows: (1) Expenditures categorized by personal services, other operating expenses or total operating expenses, and debt service, including lease payments, related to debt. (2) A listing of fund balances, specifically identifying balances in funds that are being used for accumulation of money for future capital needs. Requires the department of local government finance (department) after July 31, 2017, to publish an annual financial and operational summary of each political subdivision on the

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Political subdivision information on the Internet. Requires local governments and school corporations to provide information for posting on the Indiana transparency Internet web site (transparency web site) as follows: (1) Expenditures categorized by personal services, other operating expenses or total operating expenses, and debt service, including lease payments, related to debt. (2) A listing of fund balances, specifically identifying balances in funds that are being used for accumulation of money for future capital needs. Requires the department of local government finance (department) after July 31, 2017, to publish an annual financial and operational summary of each political subdivision on the

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24SenatePublic Law 208
2016-03-24SenateSigned by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-08SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-02SenateSenate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 313: yeas 49, nays 0
2016-03-01SenateMotion to concur filed
2016-02-29HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2016-02-29HouseRepresentative Moed added as cosponsor
2016-02-29HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 275: yeas 97, nays 0
2016-02-25HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-02-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-02-15HouseRepresentative Riecken added as cosponsor
2016-02-09HouseRepresentative Ober added as cosponsor
2016-02-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2016-01-22SenateReferred to the House
2016-01-21SenateSenator Walker added as second author
2016-01-21SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Zent
2016-01-21SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 35: yeas 48, nays 0
2016-01-19SenateSenator Breaux added as coauthor
2016-01-19SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-01-14SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2016-01-05SenateAuthored by Senator Miller Pete

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/senate/126/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/2/c/9e2ce6d4/SB0126.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/1/d/f31dfb73/SB0126.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/c/4/08c44e06/SB0126.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/f/8/a0f8b697/SB0126.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/5/d/645d8226/SB0126.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/4/e/f84ee78a/SB0126.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/d/0/c5d074f6/SB0126.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/f/4/e9f423a9/SB0126.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/f/7/c0f72b8e/SB0126.35.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/c/4/55c459dc/SB0126.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/c/d/84cd7c16/SB0126.275.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/e/0/2ee060e2/SB0126.313.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback