IN SB0121 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Volunteer firefighter allowances. Increases the minimum volunteer firefighter clothing and automobile allowance (allowance) that a city, town, or township (unit) is required to pay to active and participating members of a volunteer fire department from $200 to $400 per year. Requires the Indiana department of homeland security (department) to reimburse a unit $200 for each allowance that the unit submits a claim to the department for reimbursement. Provides for joint claim submission and proportional reimbursement of an allowance if a portion of the allowance is paid by more than one unit. Establishes the volunteer firefighter allowance fund as a dedicated fund administered by the department for the purpose of reimbursing units for allowances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Volunteer firefighter allowances. Increases the minimum volunteer firefighter clothing and automobile allowance (allowance) that a city, town, or township (unit) is required to pay to active and participating members of a volunteer fire department from $200 to $400 per year. Requires the Indiana department of homeland security (department) to reimburse a unit $200 for each allowance that the unit submits a claim to the department for reimbursement. Provides for joint claim submission and proportional reimbursement of an allowance if a portion of the allowance is paid by more than one unit. Establishes the volunteer firefighter allowance fund as a dedicated fund administered by the department for the purpose of reimbursing units for allowances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05SenateWithdrawn
2019-02-04SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Niemeyer added as third author
2019-01-24SenateSenator Buck added as second author
2019-01-24SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-22SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Tomes

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback